FRIENDS OF EXNING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1050867
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 July 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 October 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required