Trustees REDBRIDGE GUJARATI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SURYAKANT MAGANBHAI PATEL Chair 12 December 2012
None on record
Sharadbhai Kanaiylal Vyas Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
MAYA RAYRELLA Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
DHIRAJLAL DEVSHI PATEL Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
INDIRA GURJAR Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
SURYAKANT RAMANBHAI PATEL Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
GIRDHARLAL BHANJI JOLAPARA Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
SAVITABEN AMRITLAL MEISURIA Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Geeta Anilkumar Patel Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
MANJULA VYAS Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
HASMUKH YAGNIK Trustee 20 March 2015
None on record
PUSHPABEN JANI Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
NARENDRA YAGNIK Trustee 12 December 2012
None on record