BOUNDARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Boundary Community School provides Study Support and Mother Tongue Language classes, Youth Activities, ICT training, Employment Support, Advice and Guidance for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 22 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ABDUL MOSABBIR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Abdul Mukit MBE | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fahomida Akttar | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shafi Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
M B Panna | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Masud Ahmed | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ripon Chowdhury | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
AKLUS ULLAH | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
LUCKEY HOQUE | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR DERIK COX OBE | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR JOGLU MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TUNU MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.31k | £17.37k | £33.33k | £10.00k | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.27k | £22.53k | £16.35k | £16.34k | £16.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.31k | £7.00k | £8.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN OF BENGALI ETHNIC ORIGIN BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE BENGALI LANGUAGE. (2) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
BETHNAL GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOUNDARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL
20 CLUB ROW
LONDON
E2 7EY
- Phone:
- 02077397678
- Email:
- info@bcs-jobnet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window