ST. MARY SHEET CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1050935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.05k £3.04k £4.97k £4.14k £3.34k
Total expenditure £77 £10.11k £971 £3.94k £2.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A