Financial history HINDERWELL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1050937
Charity reporting is overdue by 1342 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £1.59k £2.18k £2.05k £738 £18
Total expenditure £2.88k £1.62k £2.67k £1.22k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A