BISHOP LONSDALE PTFA

Charity number: 1050957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required