Trustees HENTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1050967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS Elisabeth Little | Chair | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wray | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donald Ian Field | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Williams | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Durrant | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Cox | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Vincent | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hope Adele Mayne | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Chalk | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.