THE BROMLEY RESOURCE CENTRE FOR THE HEARING IMPAIRED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DISPLAY OF EQUIPMENT, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THE HEARING IMPAIRED IN BROMLEY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £48,718 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bromley
Governance
- 23 November 1995: Standard registration
- 14 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 September 2016: Funds transferred to 1073468 BREAKTHROUGH (DEAF-HEARING INTEGRATION)
- DEAF ACCESS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.12k | £99.32k | £74.70k | £82.96k | £72.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.93k | £97.04k | £90.13k | £87.45k | £93.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 10 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 10 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 15 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 14 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2011
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF, DEAF-BLIND, DEAFENED AND HARD OF HEARING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE AND OTHER FACILITIES OFFERING INFORMATION, COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH PERSONS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DEAF, DEAF-BLIND, DEAFENED AND HARD OF HEARING PERSONS AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MATTERS CONNECTED WITH HEARING AND SIGHT IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window