THE MARJORIE AND GEOFFREY JONES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 February 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 February 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 February 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 25 February 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 25 February 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2017 08 December 2017 On time Download