THE MARJORIE AND GEOFFREY JONES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 25/02/2017 25/02/2018 25/02/2019 25/02/2020 25/02/2021
Total gross income £28.59k £24.59k £22.79k £21.74k £14.94k
Total expenditure £97.59k £98.26k £94.36k £80.10k £28.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A