Accounts and annual returns 16TH BARNSLEY (ROYSTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051053
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 Not Required