Financial history 16TH BARNSLEY (ROYSTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051053
Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/06/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £17.26k £16.20k £13.62k £6.13k £10.10k
Total expenditure £17.79k £14.02k £9.67k £5.92k £10.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500