ST ALBANS CATHEDRAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1051072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GINI TROWER Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
CHRISTOPHER MELLUISH Trustee 02 April 2012
FUTURE LIVING HERTFORD Received: On time
KEITH RICHARD BROWN Trustee 09 March 2021 None on record
Richard David John Pinel Trustee 09 March 2021
THE EDINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION Received: 42 days late
JOHN PALMER DL Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
PETER LETANKA Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
CHRISTOPHER MUHLEY Chair None on record
RALPH ABEL SMITH Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
ANDREW LUCAS Trustee None on record
MOIRA DEAN Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record