JENNER VACCINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1051079
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 May 2020 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 February 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)