JENNER VACCINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1051079
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £21.03k £15.43k £14.93k £12.70k £12.86k
Total expenditure £190.26k £110.93k £138.96k £92.92k £46.95k