JENNER VACCINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1051079
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Venugopal Nair Trustee 02 February 2016 None on record
PROF ANDREW POLLARD Trustee None on record
Dr Bryan Charleston Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record
Dr Michael James Francis Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID MAXWELL SALISBURY Trustee 31 January 2012 None on record
Professor Helen Alison Fletcher Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record
Professor Gavin Robert Screaton Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record