19th EPPING FOREST SOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 30/06/2020
Total gross income £22.71k £12.37k £20.25k £14.73k £18.90k
Total expenditure £17.15k £15.26k £14.83k £16.24k £24.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A