Trustees THE HEREFORD CATHEDRAL PERPETUAL TRUST

Charity number: 1051168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prince Charles Raoul de Rohan Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Katherine Hale Garnier Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Richard Banks Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Nicholas Michael George Harvey Trustee 03 February 2022
None on record
Very Revd Sarah Romilly Denner Brown Trustee 02 October 2021
THE HEREFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
REV ROLAND MUCKLESTON
Overdue by 117 days
THE HEREFORD CATHEDRAL ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Recently registered
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY AND SAINT ETHELBERT IN HEREFORD
Recently registered
Julia Budd Trustee 19 February 2021
None on record
Thomas Nathaniel Hone Trustee 25 September 2018
HIGHLAND SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE HONE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BOSBURY PARISH HALL
Overdue by 25 days
THE ASHBY ELMS SCHOOL TRUST
Overdue by 25 days