Financial history ST CATHERINE'S PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051179
Charity reporting is overdue by 1117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £10.17k £10.02k £11.20k £6.65k £6.12k
Total expenditure £7.80k £7.14k £7.29k £16.98k £7.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A