Accounts and annual returns LONDON ROAD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1051204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window