Financial history LONDON ROAD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1051204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £75.42k £72.97k £76.07k £61.72k £58.96k
Total expenditure £68.62k £66.99k £68.89k £63.33k £58.50k
Income from government contracts £62.87k £59.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £65.36k £52.21k N/A