Trustees LONDON ROAD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1051204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Shaw Chair 03 March 2015
None on record
Lydia Worts-Toms Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Katie Morgan Trustee 18 August 2019
None on record
Mark Paul Linford-Hazell Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
RESETTE COPPACK Trustee 03 January 2003
None on record
BRIAN COPPACK Trustee
None on record