THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN HAVERFORDWEST

Charity number: 1051322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required