THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN HAVERFORDWEST

Charity number: 1051322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.19k £3.60k £2.86k £2.45k £4.81k
Total expenditure £1.09k £2.36k £2.20k £315 £4.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A