AL-QUAIM ISLAMIC MISSION

Charity number: 1051331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £111.51k £101.25k £89.28k £86.04k £57.62k
Total expenditure £52.60k £64.22k £68.32k £70.06k £47.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A