Accounts and annual returns The Friends of Great Chesterford Primary Academy

Charity number: 1051362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 August 2020 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required