Financial history BURMANTOFTS COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1051368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £382.25k £260.08k £271.05k £406.85k £545.54k
Total expenditure £353.55k £340.54k £297.78k £301.88k £521.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £95.88k £161.58k £170.58k £108.96k £41.55k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £100
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £545.44k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £521.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0