Trustees 3RD NORTHOLT (ST BARNABAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rakhesh Bangole Ravichandra Rao Trustee 12 June 2022
None on record
Sophie Tebbit Trustee 17 July 2021
None on record
Maximilian Luke Willoughby Trustee 17 July 2021
None on record
TRUDIE FRITH Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Artur Olczyk Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Lesley Tucker Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Robert Barker Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Liam James Robert Tebbit Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
Rachel Chisholm Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
EMMA GREEN Trustee 06 June 2012
None on record