FRIENDS OF THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends act to raise funds and support the work of The Aldingbourne Trust, which is a charity that supports people with disabilities to develop and live the lives they choose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 December 1995: Standard registration
- 13 April 2016: Funds received from 255764 THE BOGNOR REGIS, CHICHESTER AND DISTRICT SOCIETY ...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellyn Cooper | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Murrell | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Livett | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Rowe | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bunker | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID HILDITCH | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Pickthall | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £4.31k | £2.75k | £14.78k | £15.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £2.23k | £1.66k | £14.67k | £18.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL/LEARNING DISABILITY,PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST
BLACKMILL LANE
NORTON
CHICHESTER
PO18 0JP
- Phone:
- 01243544607
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window