LEEDS & YORK PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1051514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charitable activities for the benefit of service users, staff and other connected parties of Leeds and York Partnership NHS Foundation Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,000
Total expenditure: £26,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LEEDS COMMUNITY AND MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES TEACHING NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Previous name)
  • LEEDS MENTAL HEALTH TEACHING AND PRIMARY CARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Previous name)
  • LEEDS PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Previous name)
  • LEEDS PARTNERSHIPS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEEDS AND YORK PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST Trustee 13 November 1995
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £112.00k £73.00k £3.00k £8.00k
Total expenditure £24.00k £31.00k £20.00k £89.00k £26.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16/7/1998 AS VARIED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 21 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PROVISION OF A PAEDIATRIC RESPITE CARE UNIT AT ANY OF LEEDS MENTAL HEALTH TEACHING NHS TRUST, SOUTH LEEDS PCT, EAST LEEDS PCT, LEEDS NORTH EAST PCT, LEEDS WEST PCT AND LEEDS NORTH WEST PCT AND THE EQUIPPING OF SUCH A UNIT 2) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN TREATED AT THE PAEDIATRIC RESPITE CARE UNIT AT ANY OF LEEDS MENTAL HEALTH TEACHING NHS TRUST, SOUTH LEEDS PCT, EAST LEEDS PCT, LEEDS NORTH EAST PCT, LEEDS WEST PCT AND LEEDS NORTH WEST PCT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 December 1998 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Main House, St Mary's House
St Mary's Road
Leeds
LS7 3JX
Phone:
01138555913