BROMYARD AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bromyard & District Local History exists to foster an interest in local and family history
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 20 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Louise Alison Palmer | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rougier Merry | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Cooper | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Thomas Morris | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mary Turrie Hughes | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Anne Miller | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Michael Sherrin Farey | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Ross | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Grant | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Campbell | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.05k | £34.38k | £13.09k | £9.85k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.80k | £10.04k | £9.83k | £9.52k | £20.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF BROMYARD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, BROMYARD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Sherford Street
Bromyard
Herefordshire
HR7 4DL
- Phone:
- 01885488755
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window