CASE TRAINING SERVICES

Charity number: 1051587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.54m £1.41m £1.36m £1.39m £1.40m
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.30m £1.26m £1.39m £1.42m
Income from government contracts £863.63k £895.19k £884.23k £852.30k £915.71k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £85.86k £972.12k £47.05k £28.44k
Income - Other trading activities £453.83k £378.84k £382.80k £441.54k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £939.28k £0 £900.73k £1.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £439 £2.46k £3.11k £3.81k £3.89k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.28m £1.21m £1.35m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £23.12k £49.92k £46.31k £22.73k
Expenditure - Governance £43.71k £76.13k £52.25k £12.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0