Trustees MUSIC IN HOSPITALS AND CARE
Charity number: 1051659

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas James Parker | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew John Ling | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Silvia Denaro | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Alasdair Dow | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jennifer MacRitchie | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Atheer Al-Salim | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dimple Keen | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Angharad Thomas | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Dutta | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Charmian Penelope May | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Maureen Hall | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Mallock | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Fiona Anne McIntosh | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jeremy Huw Williams PhD DMus | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.