Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE CHURCH COALVILLE

Charity number: 1051891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window