Financial history NEW LIFE CHURCH COALVILLE

Charity number: 1051891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £62.77k £72.01k £70.76k £95.38k £241.00k
Total expenditure £62.37k £52.84k £71.54k £76.86k £128.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £3.00k £40.71k