Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST BEES SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051935
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.81k £1.16k £816 £769 £575
Total expenditure £4.74k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A