Accounts and annual returns BATLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1051958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 February 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required