Financial history BATLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1051958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.57k £19.68k £12.93k £26.45k £15.28k
Total expenditure £12.76k £7.94k £12.39k £17.91k £16.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A