SOLID ROCK HAVERCROFT

Charity number: 1051965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £41.16k £40.58k £44.52k £39.25k £45.57k
Total expenditure £42.40k £35.72k £44.54k £44.05k £45.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1.00k £1.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.00k N/A £3.00k