Accounts and annual returns BACK CHAT THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1052051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required