CURLEDGE STREET ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1052070
Charity reporting is overdue by 448 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £4.77k £8.57k £3.61k £659 £0
Total expenditure £7.12k £8.78k £3.63k £2.78k £117
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A