Trustees SUE RYDER
Charity number: 1052076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rima Makerem | Chair | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Tabetha Darmon | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Polly Bishop | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kevin Andrew Richmond | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Linda Ann Goodacre | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ekaete Christine Kanu | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Guy Richard Douwe Boersma | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Susan Averil Hopgood | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kevin Jonathan Rusling | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Katherine Louise Buxton | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nicola Josephine Hayes | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
HELEN THOMSON | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stuart James Hudson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.