Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1052170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 September 2020 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window