Financial history NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1052170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £80.20k £75.51k £61.92k £64.01k £38.59k
Total expenditure £69.14k £159.45k £92.23k £48.74k £42.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A