Financial history THE LOVELACE TRUST

Charity number: 1052171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.21k £3.20k £3.24k £3.28k £3.26k
Total expenditure £600 £900 £1.30k £1.35k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A