Accounts and annual returns ECLECTIC VOICES SOCIETY

Charity number: 1052289
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 August 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 August 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 March 2023 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 March 2022 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 March 2022 249 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 July 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 July 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 September 2019 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 September 2019 79 days late Download Open in new window