Financial history DORRINGTON KIDSCLUB

Charity number: 1052399
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2018 01/08/2019 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022
Total gross income £62.48k £70.77k £54.69k £47.80k £55.87k
Total expenditure £59.75k £69.91k £56.98k £54.47k £57.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.23k £9.35k N/A