SANT BANI (UK)

Charity number: 1052402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £2.79k £3.20k £3.46k £4.06k £4.64k
Total expenditure £321 £551 £880 £842 £820
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A