ARCHDIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM NUNEATON AND DISTRICT CATHOLIC FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1052425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.78k £4.29k £5.27k £4.46k £6.00k
Total expenditure £4.64k £4.19k £6.72k £3.67k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A