BURNT ASH PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A

Charity number: 1052481
Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 545 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 545 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 911 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 911 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1276 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1276 days
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required